Bayley v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Jason S Bayley
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05126
Filed: July 18, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2008 11 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 10 affirming decision of the Administrative Law Judge and dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 5, 2008. (ct)
May 9, 2008 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jason S Bayley. Objections to R&R due by 5/27/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 9, 2008. (ct)
January 3, 2008 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 9, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Jason S Bayley. (Cazort, Mildred)
November 14, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion to Continue; ( Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/7/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/7/2008.) Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 14, 2007. (jn)
November 14, 2007 6 First MOTION to Continue by Jason S Bayley. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Cazort, Mildred)
October 16, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 11/15/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 10/16/2007. (caz)
October 16, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/15/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/17/2007. (mfr)
October 16, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 28, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
July 18, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Jason S Bayley and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 7/6/07. Court directs service to be completed by plaintiff. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on July 16, 2007. (ct)
July 18, 2007 3 AFFIDAVIT of Jason Bayley filed by Jason S Bayley re 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (ct)
July 18, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Jason S Bayley. (ct)
July 18, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Jason S Bayley. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 7/6/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayley v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason S Bayley
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?