Mitchell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: John T. Mitchell, Jr.
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05137
Filed: August 3, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2008 13 JUDGMENT (ORDER) on Attorney Fees in favor of John T. Mitchell, Jr against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 23, 2008. (ct)
June 17, 2008 12 RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 12, 2008 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by John T. Mitchell, Jr. (Brooks, Evelyn)
June 12, 2008 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by John T. Mitchell, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1)-Memorandum Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A (2)-Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
March 26, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER reversing decision of commissioner and remanding case to US Agency. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 26, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
March 26, 2008 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 26, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
November 7, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 11, 2007 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by John T. Mitchell, Jr. (Brooks, Evelyn)
September 11, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff mustfile a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 10/11/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 09/11/2007. (cla)
September 11, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/11/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/12/2007. (mfr)
September 11, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 13, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 13, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm) Modified on 8/15/2007 to correct attachment links (jn).
August 3, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 7/30/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 1, 2007. (ct)
August 3, 2007 2 MOTION (APPLICATION) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John T. Mitchell, Jr. (ct)
August 3, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by John T. Mitchell, Jr. Filed nunc pro tunc as of July 30, 2007(ct) Modified on 8/3/2007 to add docket text(ct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Mitchell, Jr.
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?