Griffith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Gwen J. Griffith
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05147
Filed: August 16, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2009 15 Featured Case ORDER on Attorney Fees in favor of Gwen J. Griffith against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 14, 2009. (tg)
December 8, 2008 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Gwen J. Griffith. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 8, 2008. (ct)
December 2, 2008 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 18, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
November 18, 2008 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Gwen J. Griffith. (Cazort, Mildred)
November 18, 2008 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Gwen J. Griffith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Statement / Billing, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
September 18, 2008 10 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 9 Report and Recommendations and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 18, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct)
August 20, 2008 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Gwen J. Griffith. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 20, 2008. (ct)
March 7, 2008 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 12, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Gwen J. Griffith. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 10, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/11/2008.Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/10/2008. (cla)
January 9, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
January 9, 2008 6 ANSWER to 2 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 8, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. Mag notice attached (ct)
August 16, 2007 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Complaint is to be filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/9/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 8/14/07. (ct)
August 16, 2007 4 AFFIDAVIT of Gwen J Griffith filed by Gwen J. Griffith re 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
August 16, 2007 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gwen J. Griffith. (ct)
August 16, 2007 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Gwen J. Griffith. Filed nunc pro tunc as of August 9, 2007. DOCUMENT REFILED TO ATTACH EXHIBIT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)
August 16, 2007 1 ***DISREGARD ENTRY-REFILED TO ATTACH EXHIBIT*** COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Gwen J. Griffith. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/9/07(ct) Modified on 8/16/2007 to add docket text(ct). Modified on 8/17/2007 to show re-filing.(jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen J. Griffith
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?