Rubio v. Larkin

Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Torres Rubio
Defendant: Larkin
Case Number: 5:2007cv05156
Filed: September 11, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on May 26, 2010. (src)
August 27, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 37 ; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 27, 2009. (src)
August 5, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 27 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Collins, Larkin, Monroe. Objections to R&R due by 8/24/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 5, 2009. (src)
September 11, 2007 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) be provisionally filed pending ruling on IFP status and service of process. Clerk is directed to provide plaintiff with an informa pauperis form with directions for plaintiff to complete and return the form by 10/1/07 . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 9/11/07. (ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubio v. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Torres Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?