Garcia Campos v. Miss Free et al

Plaintiff: Luis E. Garcia Campos
Defendant: Miss Free and Thompson
Case Number: 5:2007cv05161
Filed: September 24, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing case. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 3, 2009. (src)
October 22, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Luis E. Garcia Campos. Objections to R&R due by 11/9/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 22, 2009. (jn)
February 26, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 16 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Miss Free, Day, Thompson and Petray. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 26, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
January 21, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Miss Free, Day, Thompson, Petray. Objections to R&R due by 2/9/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 21, 2009. (jn)
February 1, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendants to file motion for summary judgment by 4/30/08. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February1, 2008. (ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia Campos v. Miss Free et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Free
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis E. Garcia Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?