Howell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Vickie D. Howell
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05167
Filed: September 28, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2009 10 Featured Case JUDGMENT affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 25, 2009. (Copy to ALJ)(jn)
March 25, 2009 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 25, 2009. (Copy to ALJ)(jn)
February 25, 2008 8 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 25, 2008 7 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Vickie D. Howell. (Brooks, Evelyn)
December 28, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/29/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on 12-28-2007. (mfj)
December 27, 2007 Featured Case This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/29/2008. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/28/2008. (cap)
December 19, 2007 6 Featured Case ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 1, 2007 5 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Vickie D. Howell. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/19/2007, answer due 12/18/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Reciept)(Brooks, Evelyn)
October 29, 2007 4 Featured Case CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on October 29, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Government's Consent)(dkg)
October 12, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant (Referral). Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
September 28, 2007 Featured Case 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service w/notice of magistrate attached (ct)
September 28, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER directing the 1 Complaint filed by Vickie D. Howell, be entered nunc pro tunc as of 9/24/07 and 2 Application for IFP, filed by Vickie D. Howell, be granted. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 26, 2007. (ct)
September 28, 2007 2 Featured Case APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Vickie D. Howell. (ct)
September 28, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Vickie D. Howell. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/24/07(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie D. Howell
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?