Scott v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Katrena L Scott
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05168
Filed: September 28, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Madison
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2008 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 11, 2008. (tg)
September 11, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER that the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is affirmed and plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 11, 2008. (tg) Modified on 9/12/2008 to correct document type (jn).
March 4, 2008 8 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 1, 2008 7 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Katrena L Scott. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 3, 2008 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/1/2008.Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 3, 2008. (lmg)
January 2, 2008 Featured Case This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (cap)
December 28, 2007 6 Featured Case ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 1, 2007 5 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Katrena L Scott. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/23/2007, answer due 12/24/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipt)(Brooks, Evelyn)
October 29, 2007 4 Featured Case CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on October 29, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Government's Consent)(dkg)
October 12, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant (Referral). Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
September 28, 2007 Featured Case 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
September 28, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER directing 1 Complaint filed by Katrena L Scott be filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/24/07 and that 2 Application to proceed IFP, filed by Katrena L Scott, be granted . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 26, 2007. (ct)
September 28, 2007 2 Featured Case APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Katrena L Scott. (ct)
September 28, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Katrena L Scott. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/24/07(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrena L Scott
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?