Banks v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Lori Lee Banks
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05169
Filed: October 4, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Carroll
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2009 14 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. in favor of Lori Lee Banks against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 19, 2009. (src)
June 16, 2009 13 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 8, 2009 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Lori Lee Banks. (Brooks, Evelyn)
June 8, 2009 11 Featured Case MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Lori Lee Banks. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1)-Memoradum Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A (2)-Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
March 9, 2009 10 Featured Case JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. section 405(g). (Copy to ALJ and OHA). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 9, 2009. (src)
March 9, 2009 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on March 9, 2009. (copy to ALJ and OHA)(src)
February 12, 2008 8 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 29, 2008 7 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Lori Lee Banks. (Brooks, Evelyn)
December 28, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/29/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on 12/28/2007. (mfj)
December 27, 2007 Featured Case This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/29/2008. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/28/2008. (cap)
December 19, 2007 6 Featured Case ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 14, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Honorable James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
November 2, 2007 5 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Lori Lee Banks. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/23/2007, answer due 12/24/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Receipt)(Brooks, Evelyn)
October 25, 2007 4 Featured Case CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on October 25, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
October 4, 2007 Featured Case 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
October 4, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Lori Lee Banks and directing plaintiff to serve defendants per instructions set out in the order. Complaint filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/26/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 26, 2007. (ct)
October 4, 2007 2 Featured Case APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Lori Lee Banks. (ct)
October 4, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Lori Lee Banks. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 9/26/07(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Lee Banks
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?