Griffin v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Sharon K Griffin
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05173
Filed: October 9, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing plaintiff's complaint re: 16 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 14, 2009. (tg)
December 5, 2008 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Sharon K Griffin. Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 5, 2008. (ct)
December 4, 2008 15 AFFIDAVIT filed by Sharon K Griffin re 14 Affidavit Correction. (Cazort, Mildred)
December 3, 2008 14 AFFIDAVIT filed by Sharon K Griffin. (Cazort, Mildred)
November 3, 2008 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff is to provide the information requested to the court by December 3, 2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 3, 2008. (tg)
November 3, 2008 12 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Sharon K Griffin. (Cazort, Mildred)
October 28, 2008 11 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiff to show cause by November 4, 2008, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file an affidavit as directed by this Court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 28, 2008. (tg)
October 7, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiff to file an affidavit indicating her exact address the date the Complaint was filed on September 28, 2007. Plaintiff is to provide this information to the court by October 21, 2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 7, 2008. (tg)
October 2, 2008 9 AFFIDAVIT filed by Sharon K Griffin re 8 Order. (Cazort, Mildred)
September 26, 2008 8 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiff to file affidavit indicating her exact current address and address the date that the complaint was filed on 9/28/07. This is to be filed by 10/2/08. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 26, 2008. (ct)
March 21, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 20, 2008 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Sharon K Griffin. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 18, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/19/2008.Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/18/2008. (cla)
January 18, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (rw)
January 18, 2008 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 20, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
October 9, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of September 28, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 4, 2007. (tg)
October 9, 2007 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sharon K Griffin. (tg)
October 9, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sharon K Griffin. (tg)
October 9, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of September 28, 2007, filed by Sharon K Griffin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision - Unfavorable)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon K Griffin
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?