Setzke v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Setzke
Defendant: Larry Norris, Warden Grimes Unit, Jane Doe, Arkansas Crime Information Center and Ron Doe
Case Number: 5:2007cv05186
Filed: October 30, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 227 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 28, 2009. (src)
May 7, 2009 227 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 202 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Raymond Setzke. Objections to R&R due by 5/26/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 7, 2009. (tg)
March 17, 2009 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 149 granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 17, 2009. (jn)
October 22, 2008 149 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raymond Setzke, 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raymond Setzke, 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Raymond Setzke. Objections to R&R due by 11/10/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 22, 2008. (ct)
October 30, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), filed by Raymond Setzke, be provisionally filed prior to determination regarding plaintiff's status as a pauper and service of process. The clerk is directed to return the IFP application to plaintiff and giving him until 11/9/07 to return the completed IFP form.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 25, 2007. (ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Setzke v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Setzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Grimes Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Crime Information Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?