Jerome v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Lee D. Jerome
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05195
Filed: November 2, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2009 11 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, affirming the decision of the ALJ and dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 5, 2009. (tg)
February 5, 2009 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Lee D. Jerome. Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 5, 2009. (tg)
February 29, 2008 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 12, 2008 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Lee D. Jerome. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 14, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/13/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on 01/14/2008. (mfj)
January 14, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (cap)
January 10, 2008 7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
January 10, 2008 6 ***DISREGARD ENTRY; REFILED TO ATTACH CORRECT PFD DOCUMENT*** ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude) Modified on 1/10/2008 (ct).
December 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Honorable James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
November 26, 2007 5 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE*** AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Lee D. Jerome. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/16/2007, answer due 1/15/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel, # 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 11/26/2007 to show incorrect filing (jn).
November 26, 2007 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Lee D. Jerome. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/15/2007, answer due 1/14/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Councel, # 2 Errata B-Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn)
November 2, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, Office of Regional Chief Counsel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
November 2, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of October 29, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on November 1, 2007. (tg)
November 2, 2007 2 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lee D. Jerome. (tg)
November 2, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of October 29, 2007, filed by Lee D. Jerome.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerome v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee D. Jerome
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?