Thompson v. Jane Doe Nurse et al

Plaintiff: William Thompson
Defendant: Jane Doe Nurse, John Doe Booking Officer, Greg Tabor and Tim Helder
Case Number: 5:2007cv05233
Filed: December 18, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendants. Case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 17, 2009. (jn)
July 20, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tim Helder, Randall Denzer, James Bertorello, Rhonda Bradley, Frank - Johnson, 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Thompson. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 20, 2009. (src)
September 2, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion for order; denying 19 Motion to Compel; denying 21 Motion to Compel; denying 24 Motion for Order. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 2, 2008. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Jane Doe Nurse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Booking Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Helder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?