Fisher v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Bertha L. Fisher
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2008cv05015
Filed: January 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Bertha L. Fisher against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 30, 2009. (src)
October 1, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Bertha L. Fisher. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 1, 2009. (src)
March 26, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 8 AND REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 26, 2009. (Copy to ALJ and OHA with R&R and Order)(src)
March 11, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Bertha L. Fisher. Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 11, 2009. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha L. Fisher
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?