Ramirez v. Ferguson et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence "Larry Lee Ramirez
Defendant: Keith Ferguson, Hunter Petray, Pop and The Jail Doctor
Case Number: 5:2008cv05038
Filed: February 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing claims against Deputy Pop and finding in favor of Lawrence (Larry) Lee Ramirez against the remaining Defendants in the amount of $59,004.00 (individual amounts provided in judgment). Defendants are not entitled to offset the damage award. Defendants are ordered to pay the $350.00 court filing fee. The Clerk is instructed to refund the funds to Plaintiff. This judgment shall bear interest at the rate of.26%. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on March 29, 2011. (src)
October 13, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 49 Report and Recommendations, 40 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lawrence (Larry) Lee Ramirez denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 13, 2010. (jas)
September 28, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS with stated modifications. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 28, 2009. (tg)
August 28, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pop, Hunter Petray, Keith Ferguson, Huskins. Objections to R&R due by 9/17/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 28, 2009. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence "Larry Lee Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Petray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jail Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?