Burns v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Carolene Burns
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2008cv05063
Filed: March 21, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Carolene Burns against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 10, 2009. (src)
May 21, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Carolene Burns. Objections to R&R due by 6/8/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 21, 2009. (src)
January 14, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 14, 2009. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolene Burns
Represented By: Randolph Mark Baltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?