Hinson v. Ferguson et al

Plaintiff: Michael Hinson
Defendant: Keith Ferguson, Gene Drake and Hunter Petray
Case Number: 5:2008cv05072
Filed: April 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Michael Hinson against Dr. Huskins and Nurse Marsha Smith. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 26, 2010. (tg)
August 28, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 38 Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 28, 2009. (src)
August 4, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Zachary Johnston, Hunter Petray, Gene Drake, Smith, Keith Ferguson, and Huskins. Objections to R&R due by 8/21/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 4, 2009. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinson v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Petray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?