Avery v. Ferguson et al

Plaintiff: Robert William Avery
Defendant: Keith - Ferguson, Hunter Petray, Dustin Carlton and Charles Tomlin
Case Number: 5:2008cv05091
Filed: April 23, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Charles Tomlin and Hunter Petray against Robert William Avery ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 14, 2010. (jas)
December 2, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 87 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Robert William Avery, 88 Report and Recommendations. Motion to Dimiss granted - Corporal Dustin Carlton and Sgt. Culotta terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 2, 2010. (jas)
November 16, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Robert William Avery. Objections to R&R due by 12/3/2010. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 16, 2010. (tg)
September 24, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 77 and granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Keith - Ferguson, Charles Tomlin, Culotta, Hunter Petray, Dustin Carlton. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2010 08:30 AM in Faye tteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Plaintiff must submit a list of witnesses to have subpoenaed for trial by 11/22/10. Pre-trial disclosures due by 11/22/10. Jury instructions must be submitted to the Court by 11/29/10.. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 24, 2010. (jn)
September 11, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Jury Trial and noting that plaintiff has made a timely demand for jury trial. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 11, 2008. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avery v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith - Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Petray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?