Weaver v. Carlton et al

Plaintiff: Mark Weaver
Defendant: Carlton, Hunter Petray, Carter and Jail Medical Staff
Case Number: 5:2008cv05167
Filed: July 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing case re: 54 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 22, 2010. (tg)
January 4, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 52 MOTION to Dismiss. Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2010. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on January 4, 2010. (jn)
August 21, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as premature 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and substituting Deputy Rankin for Deputy Rakin; Deputy Blagg for Deputy Blugg and Deputy Barr for Deputy Bar. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 21, 2009. (tg)
July 24, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 34 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wales, Strickland, Blugg, Carter, Wright, Bar, Torres, Tucker, Engleman, Roland, Rakin, Johnson, Carlton, Lockhart, Elkington, Morrison, Johnston, Hunter Petray, Keith Ferguson, Ewing, Vaughn, Robbins, - Bailey. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 21, 2009. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Carlton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Petray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?