Kendrick v. Scott et al

Plaintiff: Catherynne W. Kendrick
Defendant: Michael Scott and John Maples
Case Number: 5:2008cv05174
Filed: August 1, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Reconsideration and re 5 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Catherynne W. Kendrick. The court has reviewed the objections and reaffirms its prior ruling adopting the Report and Recommendations and dismissing the 2241 Petition. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 21, 2008. (ct) Modified on 10/22/2008 to correct document type(jn).
October 8, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 3 Report and Recommendations and dismissing case. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 8, 2008. (ct)
September 15, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Catherynne W. Kendrick. Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 12, 2008. (ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendrick v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherynne W. Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?