Keating v. Freeman et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Michael Keating
Defendant: Freeman and Randall Denzer
Case Number: 5:2008cv05187
Filed: August 21, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 25 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 10, 2010. (jas)
July 17, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 17, 2009. (src)
June 19, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2) filed by Randall Denzer, Freeman. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 19, 2009. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keating v. Freeman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Michael Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Denzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?