McMannis v. Benton County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: David Aurther McMannis
Defendant: Benton County Detention Center, Jerreme Reece, Hunter Petray and Monroe
Case Number: 5:2008cv05224
Filed: October 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing case. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 19, 2010. (src)
February 25, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by David Aurther McMannis. Objections to R&R due by 3/15/2010. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on February 25, 2010. (tg)
December 29, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 7 Report and Recommendations; Benton County Detention Center and Jerreme Reece terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 29, 2008. (ct)
November 5, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by David Aurther McMannis. Objections to R&R due by 11/24/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 5, 2008. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMannis v. Benton County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Aurther McMannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerreme Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Petray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?