Hayes v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Plaintiff: Clifford D. Hayes
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv05122
Filed: June 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:1821 Default of Loan by Promissary Note
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 29, 2015. (tg)
July 17, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 14 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Plaintiff's service of process is extended to 45 days from the date of this order, which the Court calculates to be September 1, 2014. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 17, 2014. (tg)
July 18, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Clifford D. Hayes against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation in the amount of $84,959.22. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on July 18, 2011. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford D. Hayes
Represented By: John Bryan Nicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?