Wilkins v. Ferguson et al

Plaintiff: William Sean Wilkins
Defendant: Keith Ferguson, Jail Doctor, Holly and Doctor
Case Number: 5:2009cv05204
Filed: September 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: Erin L. Setser
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 16, 2011. (src)
February 19, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Claims against "Doctor seen by Plaintiff at Mercy Medical Center in June of 2009" are dismissed.. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 19, 2010. (src)
October 20, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by William Sean Wilkins. Objections to R&R due by 11/6/2009. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 20, 2009. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Sean Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?