Old Republic National Title Insurance Company v. Access Title, Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Defendant: Access Title, Ltd and Northwest Escrow Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv05007
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED ORDER 61 , case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 23, 2011. (src)
January 20, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 3 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 20, 2010. (src)
January 19, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on January 19, 2010. (tg)
January 15, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 13 and a Temporary Restraining Order (set out in order) will apply to Northwest Escrow Services until the hearing set for 1/19/10 at 1:00 before the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this order on NW Escrow as soon as possible. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 15, 2010. (jn)
January 14, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 11 Report and Recommendations,. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 14, 2010. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company v. Access Title, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Monte Darrel Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Title, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Escrow Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?