McNeel v. KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC

Plaintiff: Dean McNeel
Defendant: KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv05043
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot 99 Motion for Attorney Fees, per advice of plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 15, 2011. (kcg)
September 6, 2011 100 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 99 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dean McNeel. (Shemin, Kenneth)
September 6, 2011 99 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dean McNeel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Shemin, Kenneth)
August 23, 2011 98 JUDGMENT in favor of Dean McNeel against KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC in the amount of $428,600.00 and interest at the rate of.11% per annum until paid. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 23, 2011. (adw)
August 11, 2011 97 Exhibit List by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC, Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (gg)
August 11, 2011 96 JURY VERDICT for plaintiff and against defendant. (gg)
August 11, 2011 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren: Jury Trial completed on 8/11/2011, day four. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (gg)
August 11, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot 64 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 11, 2011. (kcg)
August 10, 2011 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren: Jury Trial held on 8/10/2011, day three. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (gg)
August 9, 2011 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren: Jury Trial held on 8/9/2011, day two. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (gg)
August 8, 2011 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren: Jury Trial held on 8/8/2011, day one. (Court Reporter Theresa Sawyer) (gg)
August 8, 2011 91 Featured Case ORDER denying 49 First Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 51 Second Motion in Limine; granting 53 Third Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 8, 2011. (tg)
August 3, 2011 90 OBJECTION(S) by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC to Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2011 89 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 66 MOTION to Strike Damages. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 1, 2011. (tg)
July 15, 2011 88 Featured Case ORDER denying 83 Motion to Amend Answer Relating to Contributory Negligence. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 15, 2011. (jn)
July 15, 2011 87 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. Specifics are set out in order. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 15, 2011. (jn)
June 22, 2011 86 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 85 Response to Motion to Amend Answer Relating to Contributory Negligence by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth) Modified to add relationship and text on 6/23/2011 (adw).
June 22, 2011 85 RESPONSE to Motion re 83 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer Relating to Contributory Negligence filed by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
June 13, 2011 84 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 83 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer Relating to Contributory Negligence by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
June 13, 2011 83 MOTION to Amend/Correct re: 16 Answer Relating to Contributory Negligence by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Phelps, John) Modified to create docket relationship on 6/14/2011 (aw).
May 26, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearings: Jury Trial RESET (DATE CERTAIN) for 8/8/2011 08:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 26, 2011. (gg)
May 5, 2011 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed filed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
May 1, 2011 81 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 79 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
May 1, 2011 80 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 79 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
May 1, 2011 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed filed by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B", # 3 Exhibit "C", # 4 Exhibit "D", # 5 Exhibit "E", # 6 Exhibit "F", # 7 Exhibit "G", # 8 Exhibit "H", # 9 Exhibit "I", # 10 Exhibit "J", # 11 Exhibit "K")(Shemin, Kenneth)
April 25, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 78 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Renewed) due May 2, 2011. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 25, 2011. (kcg)
April 22, 2011 78 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed by Dean McNeel. (Shemin, Kenneth)
April 12, 2011 77 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2011 76 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2011 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Puryear, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearings: Jury Trial RESET for 10/31/2011 (DATE CERTAIN) 08:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 5, 2011. (gg)
March 24, 2011 74 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 73 Response to Motion to Strike Damages by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
March 24, 2011 73 RESPONSE to Motion re 66 MOTION to Strike Damages filed by Dean McNeel. (Shemin, Kenneth)
March 21, 2011 72 Featured Case ORDER that Court will allow the submission of a motion for summary judgment within thirty days of this Order. Response will be due fourteen days thereafter, and reply -- if any -- due seven days after response. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 21, 2011. (tg)
March 17, 2011 71 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 70 Response to Motion by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
March 17, 2011 70 RESPONSE to Motion re 64 MOTION to Strike Witnesses Listed by Plaintiff filed by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
March 14, 2011 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re 53 Third MOTION in Limine Reply to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Response to Defendant's Third Motion in Limine filed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2011 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 First MOTION in Limine Reply to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Response to Defendant's First Motion in Limine filed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2011 67 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 66 MOTION to Strike Damages by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2011 66 MOTION to Strike Damages by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Puryear, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2011 65 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 64 MOTION to Strike Witnesses Listed by Plaintiff by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2011 64 MOTION to Strike Witnesses Listed by Plaintiff by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Puryear, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2011 63 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 62 Response to Motion in Limine (Third) Filed by Defendant by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
March 7, 2011 62 RESPONSE to Motion re 53 Third MOTION in Limine filed by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
March 7, 2011 61 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 60 Response to Motion in Limine (Second) Filed by Defendant by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
March 7, 2011 60 RESPONSE to Motion re 51 Second MOTION in Limine filed by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
March 7, 2011 59 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 58 Response to Motion in Limine (First) Filed by Defendant by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B", # 3 Exhibit "C", # 4 Exhibit "D", # 5 Exhibit "E")(Shemin, Kenneth)
March 7, 2011 58 RESPONSE to Motion re 49 First MOTION in Limine filed by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
February 28, 2011 57 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Dean McNeel. (Shemin, Kenneth)
February 28, 2011 56 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages and denying 46 Supplement to Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 25, 2011. (jas)
February 23, 2011 TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Erin L. Setser: Settlement Conference held on 2/23/2011. (gh)
February 21, 2011 54 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 53 Third MOTION in Limine by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2011 53 Third MOTION in Limine by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2011 52 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 51 Second MOTION in Limine by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2011 51 Second MOTION in Limine by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2011 50 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 49 First MOTION in Limine by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2011 49 First MOTION in Limine by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Puryear, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2010 48 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC to 46 Supplemental MOTION to Supplement 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGESSupplemental MOTION to Supplement 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES SECOND STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2010 47 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 46 Supplemental MOTION to Supplement 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGESSupplemental MOTION to Supplement 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2010 46 Supplemental MOTION to Supplement 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Puryear, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2010 45 NOTICE by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC Notice of Discovery Responses (Puryear, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2010 44 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 8, 2010. (tg)
November 5, 2010 43 NOTICE by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC re 39 Statement of Facts, Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Disputed Material Facts (Phelps, John)
November 5, 2010 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages Reply to Plaintiff's Brief Responding to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
November 3, 2010 41 AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Dean McNeel filed by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B", # 3 Exhibit "C", # 4 Exhibit "D")(Shemin, Kenneth)
November 3, 2010 40 RESPONSE to Motion re 38 MOTION to Compel ; Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, or in the Alternative, Motion for Continuance Response to Motion to Compel; Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, or in the Alternative, Motion for Continuance filed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
October 29, 2010 39 SUPPLMENTAL STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 36 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages (SUPPLEMENTAL) and Statement of Material Facts as to Which Plaintiff Contends a Genuine Issue Exists to be Tried by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth) Modified text on 11/1/2010 (jas).
October 29, 2010 38 MOTION to Compel ; Motion to Amend Scheduling Order, or in the Alternative, Motion for Continuance by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B", # 3 Exhibit "C", # 4 Exhibit "D", # 5 Exhibit "E", # 6 Exhibit "F", # 7 Exhibit "G", # 8 Exhibit "H", # 9 Exhibit "I")(Shemin, Kenneth)
October 29, 2010 37 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 36 Response to Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Liability and Damages by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Shemin, Kenneth)
October 29, 2010 36 RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages Regarding Damages filed by Dean McNeel(D.D.S., P.A.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B")(Shemin, Kenneth)
October 25, 2010 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Statement of Disputed Material Facts filed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
October 21, 2010 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Puryear, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 2/23/2011 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 2nd flr (Rm 213) before Honorable Erin L. Setser. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 20, 2010. (gh)
October 19, 2010 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC, filed by Dean McNeel.(Shemin, Kenneth)
October 19, 2010 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 19, 2010. (tg)
October 19, 2010 30 AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Dean McNeel filed by Dean McNeel Supplemented for Affidavit filed November 18, 2010. (Shemin, Kenneth)
October 18, 2010 29 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 28 Response to Motion, for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages by Dean McNeel. (Shemin, Kenneth)
October 18, 2010 28 RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages filed by Dean McNeel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B", # 3 Exhibit "C", # 4 Exhibit "D", # 5 Exhibit "E")(Shemin, Kenneth)
October 18, 2010 27 AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Dean McNeel filed by Dean McNeel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B", # 3 Exhibit "C")(Shemin, Kenneth) Modified on 10/19/2010 (tg).
October 18, 2010 26 STATEMENT OF FACTS Statement of Disputed Facts and Statement of Material Facts as to Which Plaintiff Contends a Genuine Issue Exists to be Tried by Dean McNeel. (Shemin, Kenneth)
October 15, 2010 25 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 24 Response to Motion by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2010 24 RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff is allowed until October 29, 2010, to respond to defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 14, 2010. (kcg)
October 13, 2010 23 RESPONSE to Motion re 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages Issue Pertaining to Damages filed by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
October 12, 2010 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Dean McNeel. (Shemin, Kenneth)
October 8, 2010 21 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Dean McNeel. (Shemin, Kenneth)
October 8, 2010 20 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Dean McNeel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Shemin, Kenneth)
October 4, 2010 19 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2010 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability and Damages by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Puryear, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2010 17 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 18 Motion for Summary Judgment by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Puryear, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/5/2010 to add link (jn).
September 23, 2010 16 AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand to 1 Complaint by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Phelps, John) Modified on 9/24/2010 (src).
September 22, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 14 Motion to Amend Answer. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 22, 2010. (kcg)
September 20, 2010 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Amend Answer by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
September 20, 2010 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Amend Answer by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Phelps, John)
August 20, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion to Extend. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 20, 2010. (tg)
August 19, 2010 12 MOTION to Extend DEFENDANTS TIME FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURES by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
July 27, 2010 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W Puryear on behalf of KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC (Puryear, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2010 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearings: Jury Trial RESET for 3/28/2011 08:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 26, 2010. THIS COURT'S PREVIOUS SCHEDULING ORDER REMAINS IN EFFECT.(gg)
July 6, 2010 10 NOTICE by Dean McNeel Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Shemin, Kenneth)
June 14, 2010 9 NOTICE by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Phelps, John)
May 20, 2010 8 STIPULATION for Preservation of Documents by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
May 19, 2010 7 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/21/2011 08:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren.. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 19, 2010. (src)
May 19, 2010 6 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC. (Phelps, John)
April 8, 2010 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/21/2011 08:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 8, 2010. (src)
March 22, 2010 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena T. Green on behalf of KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC (Green, Serena)
March 19, 2010 3 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC.(Phelps, John)
March 19, 2010 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John V. Phelps on behalf of KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC (Phelps, John)
March 1, 2010 Summons Issued as to KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. (src)
March 1, 2010 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 5001687), filed by Dean McNeel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Purchase Agreement)(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeel v. KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KaVo Dental Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean McNeel
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?