Argall v. Benton County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Andrea Elizabeth Argall
Defendant: Benton County Detention Center and J Becker
Case Number: 5:2010cv05059
Filed: April 1, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: Erin L. Setser
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Dismiss Case and adopting Report and Recommendations re 34 Report and Recommendations. Case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 7, 2011. (adw)
November 29, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 10 Report and Recommendations. Benton County Detention Center terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 29, 2010. (jas)
October 28, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Andrea Elizabeth Argall. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2010. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 28, 2010. (jas)
April 1, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately transfer a copy of this order and the original file to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/1/10. (bkp)[Transferred from ared on 4/1/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argall v. Benton County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Elizabeth Argall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?