City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Michael T. Duke, Charles M. Holley, Jr., H. Lee Scott, Jr., Eduardo Solorzano Morales and Eduardo Castro-Wright
Case Number: 5:2012cv05162
Filed: July 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES AND AWARD TO LEAD PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(4). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 8, 2019. (src)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting 434 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement ; ( In Court Settlement Hearing set for 4/4/2019 10:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey.) See order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 6, 2018. (src)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 STIPULATED ORDER establishing protocol for production of documents. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 19, 2016. (tg)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER ADOPTING 133 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 89 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 26, 2014. (tg)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/25/12. (rd) [Transferred from tnmd on 7/26/2012.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: Cynthia J. Billings
Represented By: Jason A. Forge
Represented By: Douglas S. Johnston, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy L. Miles
Represented By: Danielle Myers
Represented By: Nicholas H. Patton
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Represented By: David C. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: George H. Brown
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dickey
Represented By: Jamie Fugitt
Represented By: Brian M. Lutz
Represented By: Marie-Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Duke
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: George H. Brown
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dickey
Represented By: Jamie Fugitt
Represented By: Brian M. Lutz
Represented By: Marie-Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M. Holley, Jr.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: George H. Brown
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dickey
Represented By: Jamie Fugitt
Represented By: Brian M. Lutz
Represented By: Marie-Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Lee Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: George H. Brown
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dickey
Represented By: Jamie Fugitt
Represented By: Brian M. Lutz
Represented By: Marie-Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Solorzano Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Castro-Wright
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: George H. Brown
Represented By: Jonathan C. Dickey
Represented By: Jamie Fugitt
Represented By: Brian M. Lutz
Represented By: Marie-Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Mark Andrew Perry
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?