City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System |
Defendant: |
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Michael T. Duke, Charles M. Holley, Jr., H. Lee Scott, Jr., Eduardo Solorzano Morales and Eduardo Castro-Wright |
Case Number: |
5:2012cv05162 |
Filed: |
July 26, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Fayetteville Office |
County: |
U.S., Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan O. Hickey |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities/Exchanges |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 8, 2019 |
Filing
458
ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES AND AWARD TO LEAD PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(4). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 8, 2019. (src)
|
December 6, 2018 |
Filing
442
ORDER granting 434 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement ; ( In Court Settlement Hearing set for 4/4/2019 10:00 AM in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey.) See order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 6, 2018. (src)
|
May 19, 2016 |
Filing
266
STIPULATED ORDER establishing protocol for production of documents. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 19, 2016. (tg)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
146
ORDER ADOPTING 133 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 89 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 26, 2014. (tg)
|
July 25, 2012 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 7/25/12. (rd) [Transferred from tnmd on 7/26/2012.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: City of Pontiac General Employees' Retirement System |
Represented By: |
George Edward Barrett |
Represented By: |
Cynthia J. Billings |
Represented By: |
Jason A. Forge |
Represented By: |
Douglas S. Johnston, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Timothy L. Miles |
Represented By: |
Danielle Myers |
Represented By: |
Nicholas H. Patton |
Represented By: |
Darren J. Robbins |
Represented By: |
David C. Walton |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jess L. Askew, III |
Represented By: |
Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. |
Represented By: |
George H. Brown |
Represented By: |
Jonathan C. Dickey |
Represented By: |
Jamie Fugitt |
Represented By: |
Brian M. Lutz |
Represented By: |
Marie-Bernarde Miller |
Represented By: |
Alexander Mircheff |
Represented By: |
Mark Andrew Perry |
Represented By: |
Teresa M. Wineland |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Michael T. Duke |
Represented By: |
Jess L. Askew, III |
Represented By: |
Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. |
Represented By: |
George H. Brown |
Represented By: |
Jonathan C. Dickey |
Represented By: |
Jamie Fugitt |
Represented By: |
Brian M. Lutz |
Represented By: |
Marie-Bernarde Miller |
Represented By: |
Alexander Mircheff |
Represented By: |
Mark Andrew Perry |
Represented By: |
Teresa M. Wineland |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Charles M. Holley, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jess L. Askew, III |
Represented By: |
Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. |
Represented By: |
George H. Brown |
Represented By: |
Jonathan C. Dickey |
Represented By: |
Jamie Fugitt |
Represented By: |
Brian M. Lutz |
Represented By: |
Marie-Bernarde Miller |
Represented By: |
Alexander Mircheff |
Represented By: |
Mark Andrew Perry |
Represented By: |
Teresa M. Wineland |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: H. Lee Scott, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Jess L. Askew, III |
Represented By: |
Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. |
Represented By: |
George H. Brown |
Represented By: |
Jonathan C. Dickey |
Represented By: |
Jamie Fugitt |
Represented By: |
Brian M. Lutz |
Represented By: |
Marie-Bernarde Miller |
Represented By: |
Alexander Mircheff |
Represented By: |
Mark Andrew Perry |
Represented By: |
Teresa M. Wineland |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Eduardo Solorzano Morales |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Eduardo Castro-Wright |
Represented By: |
Jess L. Askew, III |
Represented By: |
Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. |
Represented By: |
George H. Brown |
Represented By: |
Jonathan C. Dickey |
Represented By: |
Jamie Fugitt |
Represented By: |
Brian M. Lutz |
Represented By: |
Marie-Bernarde Miller |
Represented By: |
Alexander Mircheff |
Represented By: |
Mark Andrew Perry |
Represented By: |
Teresa M. Wineland |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?