Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Cuker Interactive, LLC

Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Defendant: Cuker Interactive, LLC
Counter_claimant: Cuker Interactive, LLC
Counter_defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv05262
Filed: August 26, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Timothy L. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2017 228 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part, and deferring in part 181 Motion in Limine. SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 20, 2017. (tg)
January 19, 2017 226 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 143 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 19, 2017. (tg)
December 22, 2016 197 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Counts One and Two of Cuker's 61 Amended Counterclaim are Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 22, 2016. (src)
November 29, 2016 173 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 137 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 29, 2016. (tg)
April 9, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 28 Motion to Compel and denying as moot 34 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 9, 2015. (tg)
December 12, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 12, 2014. (jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. v. Cuker Interactive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuker Interactive, LLC
Represented By: Debra Kay Brown
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cuker Interactive, LLC
Represented By: Debra Kay Brown
Represented By: Steven T. Shults
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Andrew King
Represented By: Teresa M. Wineland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?