Wilmoth v. Gilbert et al
Plaintiff: Michael Shane Wilmoth
Defendant: Meyer Gilbert, John Doe Detention Major, John Doe Captain, John and Jane Doe Doctors and Nurses, Jesse Martinez, Michael V. Lira, Austin Murphy, Kemp and Dowyer
Case Number: 5:2016cv05244
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Timothy L. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Erin L. Setser
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 144 Motion regarding spoliation as described herein. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 7, 2019. (tg) Modified on 8/7/2019 to edit text(tg).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER that good cause is shown to order Mr. Chadick to reimburse the Clerk of the Court the sum of $661.64 because of inability to recall two members of the venire panel (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 2, 2018. (tg)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 25, 2018. (src)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 49 Motion for Summary Judgment, Dr. Saez, Nurse Ray and Nurse Smith are dismissed with prejudice; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; Jeremy Guyll, Kemp, Michael V. Lira, Jesus Martinez, Dowyer and Meyer Gilbert (Benton County, Arkansas) are dismissed. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 20, 2018. (tg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmoth v. Gilbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shane Wilmoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyer Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Detention Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Captain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Doctors and Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V. Lira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dowyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?