Browne et al v. PAM Transport Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Browne, Antonio Caldwell and Lucretia Hall
Defendant: PAM Transport Inc and John Does
Case Number: 5:2016cv05366
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy L. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Granting 297 Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. See Order for specific details. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 31, 2020. (Brooks, Timothy)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION AND ORDER on the calculation of damages for the minimum wage claims relating to 160 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lucretia Hall, Antonio Caldwell, David Browne, 216 Opinion and Order, 219 Order, 244 Supplement, filed by PAM Transport Inc, John Does, and 245 Supplement filed by Lucretia Hall, Antonio Caldwell, David Browne. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 6, 2020. (src)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 OPINION AND ORDER deferring ruling on 146 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 154 Motion to Modify Certification Order; denying 156 Motion to Decertify FLSA and Rule 23 Classes; denying 158 Motion to Dismiss Opt-Ins and granting in part and denying in part 213 Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 24, 2020. (tg)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion to Strike. The Clerk is Directed to Strike parts of documents 157 167 and 205 . See order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 17, 2020. (src) Modified on 1/17/2020 (src).
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Memorandum Opinion and ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 151 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment based on Judicial Estoppel. NOTE: Per the Order, the Parties are directed to confer and file any supplemental briefing by no later than January 10, 2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 31, 2019. (Brooks, Timothy)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 OPINION AND ORDER denying 198 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 30, 2019. (tg)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion to Exclude Expert Report (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 16, 2019. (tg)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 84 Motion to Decertify Conditional Collective FLSA Action and granting 91 Motion to Certify Class. Parties must confer and then provide the Court with an agreed-to form of and plan for notice to class members by no later than 2/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 25, 2019. (tg)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 55 Motion to Dismiss and denying 56 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 19, 2018. (tg)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER denying 65 Motion to Strike (See for specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 16, 2018. (tg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browne et al v. PAM Transport Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Browne
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Travis Martindale-Jarvis
Represented By: Richard Swartz
Represented By: Justin L Swidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Caldwell
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Travis Martindale-Jarvis
Represented By: Richard Swartz
Represented By: Justin L Swidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucretia Hall
Represented By: Joshua S. Boyette
Represented By: Travis Martindale-Jarvis
Represented By: Richard Swartz
Represented By: Justin L Swidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?