Doe v. University of Arkansas - Fayetteville et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Tyler R. Farrar, Jon Comstock, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, Dina Wood, Eric Specking, Kristin Barnett and Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas
Case Number: 5:2018cv05182
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Doe. (Zachary, Heather)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the #17 motion to dismiss is extended to November 5, 2018. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 16, 2018. (rab)
October 15, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction by John Doe. (Zachary, Heather)
October 9, 2018 Filing 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/15/2018. Jury Trial set for 8/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd floor (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on October 9, 2018. (jas)
October 8, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kristin Barnett, Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas, Jon Comstock, Tyler R. Farrar, Eric Specking, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, Dina Wood. (Cordi, C.)
October 8, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kristin Barnett, Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas, Jon Comstock, Tyler R. Farrar, Eric Specking, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, Dina Wood. (Cordi, C.)
October 8, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Joseph Cordi, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Cordi, C.)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Tyler R. Farrar served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Zachary, Heather)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. University of Arkansas - Fayetteville served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Zachary, Heather)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Jon Comstock served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. (Zachary, Heather)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Zachary, Heather)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by John Doe re #6 Summons Issued, Proof of Service on Jon Comstock (Zachary, Heather)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by John Doe re #6 Summons Issued, Proof of Service on Board of Trustees (Zachary, Heather)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by John Doe re #6 Summons Issued, Proof of Service on U of A (Zachary, Heather)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Gaines on behalf of John Doe. (Gaines, Robert)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Christopher Zachary on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Zachary, Justin)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Kristin Barnett, Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas, Jon Comstock, Tyler R. Farrar, Eric Specking, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, Dina Wood and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (tg)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #3 MOTION For Permission To Proceed Under A Pseudonym by John Doe. (tg)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION For Permission To Proceed Under A Pseudonym by John Doe. (tg)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John Doe. (tg)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kristin Barnett, Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas, Jon Comstock, Tyler R. Farrar, Eric Specking, University of Arkansas - Fayetteville, Dina Wood, filed by John Doe.(tg)
September 14, 2018 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1781765.. (Zachary, Heather)
September 14, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff John Doe. Complaint #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Alec Gaines. (tg)
September 14, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/17/2018 (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. University of Arkansas - Fayetteville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler R. Farrar
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Comstock
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas - Fayetteville
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dina Wood
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Specking
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Barnett
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Heather G. Zachary
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Justin Christopher Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?