Riot Games, Inc. v. Kooshesh

Plaintiff: Riot Games, Inc.
Defendant: Sayed Arian Kooshesh
Case Number: 5:2018cv05202
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 Docket Annotation of Mailing: Initial Scheduling Order #11 mailed to non-ECF participant, Sayed Arian Kooshesh on 11/13/18. (slc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 1/15/2019 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/19/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 13, 2018. (slc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sayed Arian Kooshesh. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(lw)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Riot Games, Inc.. Sayed Arian Kooshesh served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memo, filed by Riot Games, Inc.. Sayed Arian Kooshesh served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Bartolomei, James)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Sayed Arian Kooshesh and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riot Games, Inc.. (Bartolomei, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Riot Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C1, #5 Exhibit C2)(Bartolomei, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Riot Games, Inc.. (Bartolomei, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Sayed Arian Kooshesh for service of the following document: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Bartolomei, James)
October 17, 2018 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number BARWDC-1801772.. (Bartolomei, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
October 17, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/19/2018 (lgd)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Riot Games, Inc. (lgd)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sayed Arian Kooshesh, filed by Riot Games, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B)(lgd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #4 Exhibit B-1 Affidavit of Service) (lgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riot Games, Inc. v. Kooshesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riot Games, Inc.
Represented By: James H. Bartolomei, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sayed Arian Kooshesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?