Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Beckum et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Fatty Hackers Sports Club & Grill and Sylvia L. Beckum
Case Number: 5:2018cv05211
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Sylvia L. Beckum. Answer to Complaint #6 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Alex T. Shirley. (src)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2019. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2019 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on December 3, 2018. (jas)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sylvia L. Beckum.(Doss, David)
October 26, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Complaint #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Matthew Finch and Katie Mehdizadegan. (lgd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A COPYRIGHT ACTION for a case initiated by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. with the filing of #1 Complaint. (lgd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Sylvia L. Beckum, Fatty Hackers Sports Club & Grill and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (lgd)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sylvia L. Beckum, Fatty Hackers Sports Club & Grill ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5006862), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Beckum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fatty Hackers Sports Club & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia L. Beckum
Represented By: David Westbrook Doss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly W. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?