Walmart Inc. et al v. Synchrony Bank
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC and Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 5:2018cv05216
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 64 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Telephone Conference held on 12/20/2018. (Dana Hayden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (slc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 63 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (TIME ONLY): Telephone Conference reset for 12/20/2018 04:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 20, 2018. (slc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 62 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Telephone Conference set at the request of counsel for 12/20/2018 04:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 18, 2018. (slc)
December 13, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Grinstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Grinstein, Joseph)
December 11, 2018 Filing 60 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/15/2019 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/28/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 11, 2018. (slc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Ryan Burningham on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Burningham, P. Ryan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 58 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. P. Ryan Burningham is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter if he/she has not already done so. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 7, 2018. (gg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 57 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joseph S. Grinstein is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter if he/she has not already done so. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 7, 2018. (gg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Attorney P. Ryan Burningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1830300) by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Leflar, Samantha)
December 6, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for Attorney Joseph S. Grinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1830067) by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Leflar, Samantha)
December 6, 2018 Filing 54 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #51 Motion to Extend. Plaintiffs may file their response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 47) by no later than January 9, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 6, 2018. (jch)
December 6, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory S. Buland on behalf of Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Buland, Cory)
December 5, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Shepard on behalf of Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Shepard, Steven)
December 5, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Atchley, Russell)
November 30, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Hansen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hansen, Drew)
November 29, 2018 Filing 49 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.SEALED DOCUMENT, Memorandum in Support of Synchrony Bank's Motion to Dismiss by Synchrony Bank. An Order was entered on 11/29/2018 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (lgd) Modified access on 12/3/2018 (src).
November 29, 2018 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 2014 Agreement)(Mitchell, Jeff)
November 29, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Synchrony Bank. (Mitchell, Jeff)
November 29, 2018 Filing 46 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #44 Motion to Seal. Defendant may file a redacted version of its Motion to Dismiss on the public docket, and may deliver an unredacted version in hard copy to the Clerk's Office for filing under seal. The redacted version may include, when necessary, slip sheets appropriately labeled "UNDER SEAL" to indicate the exhibits or other materials that have been omitted in their entirety from the public filing. Furthermore, to the extent any further briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss requires redaction, all parties are given advance leave to file redacted versions on the public docket and unredacted versions under seal in the same manner as described above. However, in no event will an entire brief be filed under seal without a corresponding redacted version of the brief also being filed on the public docket, unless prior leave of the Court is sought. The Court may reconsider the appropriate scope of redaction at a later date. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 29, 2018. (jch)
November 28, 2018 Filing 45 BRIEF in Support of #44 MOTION For Leave To File Under Seal by Synchrony Bank. (lgd)
November 28, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION For Leave to File Under Seal by Synchrony Bank. (lgd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #1 Sealed Motion) (lgd).
November 28, 2018 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Synchrony Bank. (Mitchell, Jeff)
November 27, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Milton P. Wilkins on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Wilkins, Milton)
November 27, 2018 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Atchley, Russell)
November 27, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon D. Todd on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Todd, Gordon)
November 27, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Robert Volpe on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Volpe, Frank)
November 27, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Mundel on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Mundel, Benjamin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. McArthur on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (McArthur, Eric)
November 27, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Letten on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Letten, Matthew)
November 27, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Hopson on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Hopson, Mark)
November 27, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Herron on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Herron, Thomas)
November 20, 2018 Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Milton P. Wilkins is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 20, 2018. (gg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Frank R. Volpe is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 20, 2018. (gg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gordon D. Todd is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 20, 2018. (gg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Benjamin M. Mundel is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 20, 2018. (gg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eric D. McArthur is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 20, 2018. (gg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Matthew J. Letten is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 20, 2018. (gg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mark D. Hopson is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 20, 2018. (gg)
November 20, 2018 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Thomas J. Herron is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 20, 2018. (gg)
November 19, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney Milton P. Wilkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1820978) by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Milton P. Wilkins)(Mitchell, Jeff)
November 19, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney Frank R. Volpe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1820977) by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Frank R. Volpe)(Mitchell, Jeff)
November 19, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney Gordon D. Todd to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1820976) by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Gordon D. Todd)(Mitchell, Jeff)
November 19, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney Benjamin M. Mundel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1820975) by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Benjamin M. Mundel)(Mitchell, Jeff)
November 19, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney Eric D. McArthur to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1820971) by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Eric D. McArthur)(Mitchell, Jeff)
November 19, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Matthew J. Letten to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1820962) by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Matthew J. Letten)(Mitchell, Jeff)
November 19, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Mark D. Hopson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1820960) by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mark D. Hopson)(Mitchell, Jeff)
November 19, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Thomas J. Herron to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1820955) by Synchrony Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Thomas J. Herron)(Mitchell, Jeff)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 Waiver by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc. of the Service of Summons. (Atchley, Russell)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bartholomew L. McLeay on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McLeay, Bartholomew)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. DREW HANSEN is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he has not already done so and enter hisr appearance in this matter; AND GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. STEVEN SHEPARD is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter; AND GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. CORY BULAND is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter; AND GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. BARTHOLOMEW L. McLEAY is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 13, 2018. (slc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Bartholomew L. McLeay to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1816653) by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Leflar, Samantha)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Cory Buland to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1816647) by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Leflar, Samantha)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Steven Shepard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1816641) by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Leflar, Samantha)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Drew Hansen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1816631) by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (Leflar, Samantha)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha B. Leflar on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Leflar, Samantha)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nick Mote on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Mote, Nick)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Mitchell on behalf of Synchrony Bank. (Mitchell, Jeff)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal is provisionally granted, subject to the possibility of reconsideration after all parties are joined. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file under seal Plaintiffs' unredacted Complaint, which was filed as Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File under Seal. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 2, 2018. (jch)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Synchrony Bank and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (tg)
November 2, 2018 Complaint fee received: $ 400, receipt number 5006870. (tg)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #3 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by all Plaintiffs. (src)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc.. (src) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2018: #1 Exhibit A Agreement Part 1 UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit A Agreement Part 2 UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B Unredacted Complaint UNDER SEAL) (src).
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by All Plaintiffs. (src)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 Redacted COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Synchrony Bank, filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC, Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC.(src) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: #1 UNREDACTED COMPLAINT) (tg).
November 1, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/5/2018 (src)
November 1, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs. Complaint, #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Neal Manne. (src)
November 1, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Complaint, #1 is (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Drew Hansen, Steven Shepard, Cory Buland. An attorney can register for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walmart Inc. et al v. Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: P. Ryan Burningham
Represented By: Joseph Grinstein
Represented By: Drew Hansen
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Cory S. Buland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: P. Ryan Burningham
Represented By: Joseph Grinstein
Represented By: Drew Hansen
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Cory S. Buland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: P. Ryan Burningham
Represented By: Joseph Grinstein
Represented By: Drew Hansen
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Cory S. Buland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: P. Ryan Burningham
Represented By: Joseph Grinstein
Represented By: Drew Hansen
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Cory S. Buland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: P. Ryan Burningham
Represented By: Joseph Grinstein
Represented By: Drew Hansen
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Cory S. Buland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: P. Ryan Burningham
Represented By: Joseph Grinstein
Represented By: Drew Hansen
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Cory S. Buland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart.Com USA, LLC
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: P. Ryan Burningham
Represented By: Joseph Grinstein
Represented By: Drew Hansen
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Cory S. Buland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Russell C. Atchley
Represented By: Samantha B. Leflar
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: P. Ryan Burningham
Represented By: Joseph Grinstein
Represented By: Drew Hansen
Represented By: Bartholomew L. McLeay
Represented By: Cory S. Buland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Thomas J. Herron
Represented By: Eric D. McArthur
Represented By: Matthew J. Letten
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mundel
Represented By: Jeff Mitchell
Represented By: Nick Mote
Represented By: Mark D. Hopson
Represented By: Frank Robert Volpe
Represented By: Milton P. Wilkins
Represented By: Gordon D. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?