Spencer v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: Winston Earl Delano Spencer
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Christina Olguin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Cindy Gomez and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 5:2018cv05236
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Kirstjen Nielsen, L. Francis Cissna, Cindy Gomez, Christina Olguin, U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security and U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services filed by Winston Spencer. (Bogart, Nathan) Modified on 12/26/2018 to edit text(tg).
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Department of Homeland Security, Cindy Gomez, Kirstjen Nielsen, Christina Olguin, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (lgd).
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to All Government Parties for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Additional Summons, #2 Supplement Additional Summons, #3 Supplement Additional Summons, #4 Supplement Additional Summons, #5 Supplement Additional Summons, #6 Supplement Additional Summons)(Bogart, Nathan)
November 27, 2018 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1824392.. (Bogart, Nathan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
November 26, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/28/2018 (lgd)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Winston Earl Delano Spencer. (lgd)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. Francis Cissna, Department of Homeland Security, Cindy Gomez, Kirstjen Nielsen, Christina Olguin, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, filed by Winston Earl Delano Spencer.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Olguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Earl Delano Spencer
Represented By: Nathan Randal Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?