Swanson v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Glen Swanson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv05240
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Dismiss Case (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 8, 2019. (lgd) Modified on 1/11/2019 to add text (tg).
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Glen Swanson. (lgd)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 Docket Annotation of Mailing: Initial Scheduling Order #9 mailed to non-ecf participant, Glen Swanson. (slc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/12/2019 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/15/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 6, 2018. (slc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bailey Knapp on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Knapp, Bailey)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Scott Jackson on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Jackson, Matthew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Jackson, Matthew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Jackson, Matthew)
December 4, 2018 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1828924.. (Jackson, Matthew)
December 3, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Bailey Knapp. (lgd)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished and mailed to non ecf participant. (lgd)
December 3, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/5/2018 (lgd)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Glen Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(lgd) Modified on 12/6/2018 (src).
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (lgd)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court, case number 04CV-18-3183., filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Represented By: Bailey Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?