Arcus Hunting, LLC v. The Gyde Group, LLC

Plaintiff: Arcus Hunting, LLC
Defendant: The Gyde Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv05244
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kameron Kelly on behalf of Arcus Hunting, LLC. (Kelly, Kameron)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Brown on behalf of Arcus Hunting, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SCOTT R. BROWN is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter if he has not already done so; AND GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. KAMERON D. KELLY is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter if he has not already done so. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 14, 2018. (slc)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Kameron D. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1834415) by Arcus Hunting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Plunkett, Clifford)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Scott R. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1834389) by Arcus Hunting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Plunkett, Clifford)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arcus Hunting, LLC. (Plunkett, Clifford)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A PATENT ACTION for a case initiated by Arcus Hunting, LLC with the filing of #1 Complaint. (Plunkett, Clifford)
December 7, 2018 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1830907.. (Plunkett, Clifford)
December 7, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/10/2018 (tg)
December 7, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to attorney(s) filing a complaint or amended complaint in a Patent action: Please complete AO Form 120 found on the Court's website (www.arwd.uscourts.gov -> ONLINE FORMS) and file it with the Court using Other Filings-Other Documents-Initial Report.Copyright/Patent/Trademark Report due 12/28/2018. (tg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Arcus Hunting, LLC. (tg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Gyde Group, LLC, filed by Arcus Hunting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arcus Hunting, LLC v. The Gyde Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arcus Hunting, LLC
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Kameron Kelly
Represented By: Scott Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gyde Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?