Hardiman v. Inmar, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Larohn Hardiman
Defendant: Carolina Logistics Services, LLC and Inmar, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv05247
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint, filed by Larohn Hardiman. Carolina Logistics Services, LLC served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Placzek, Gregory)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint, filed by Larohn Hardiman. Inmar, Inc. served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (Placzek, Gregory)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Carolina Logistics Services, LLC, Inmar, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Carolina Logistics Services, LLC for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Placzek, Gregory)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Inmar, Inc. for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Placzek, Gregory)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Carolina Logistics Services, LLC, filed by Larohn Hardiman. (Placzek, Gregory)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Inmar, Inc., filed by Larohn Hardiman. (Placzek, Gregory)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Larohn Hardiman. (tg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Carolina Logistics Services, LLC, Inmar, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5006897), filed by Larohn Hardiman.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardiman v. Inmar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Logistics Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larohn Hardiman
Represented By: Gregory Allen Placzek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?