United States of America v. $24,990.00 In United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $24,990.00 In United States Currency
Case Number: 5:2019cv05019
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF PUBLICATION as to #1 Complaint of Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Forfeiture Action, #2 Exhibit B - Advertisement Certification Report)(Jennen, Aaron)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Signature Card)(Jennen, Aaron)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Signature Card)(Jennen, Aaron)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture, filed by United States of America. $24,990.00 In United States Currency served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Signature Card)(Jennen, Aaron)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT Returned Executed on 2/5/2019 as to $24,990.00 United States Currency. (tg) (tg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint of Forfeiture in Rem (Jennen, Aaron)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint of Forfeiture in Rem (Jennen, Aaron)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint of Forfeiture in Rem (Jennen, Aaron)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT OF ARREST/Notice in Rem as to $24,990.00 In United States Currency issued and delivered to US Marshal for service (tg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by United States of America. (tg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $24,990.00 In United States Currency, filed by United States of America.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $24,990.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,990.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Aaron Lance Jennen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?