Leato et al v. Western Union Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato and John M. Leato
Defendant: Western Union Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05020
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE AS FRIVOLOUS. The IFP motions #3 & #6 are denied as MOOT. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 5, 2019. (tg)
February 6, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed AO 239 form be filed. Completed IFP form due by 2/11/2019. The Court also directs the Clerk of the Court to seal document #3 (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 5, 2019. (tg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form mailed to Petitioner and Pro Se Manual provided. (tg)
February 1, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Western Union Holdings, Inc., filed by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Federal Trade Commission Consumer Information)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leato et al v. Western Union Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Union Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?