Leato et al v. Horizon Bank et al

Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato and John M. Leato
Defendant: Horizon Bank and Horizon Bancorp, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05027
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS FRIVOLOUS. The IFP motion #4 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 4, 2019. (tg) Modified on 3/4/2019 (tg). Modified on 3/14/2019 (src).
February 11, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. Mailed to non ecf participant, Leato. (lgd) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (lgd).
February 8, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (lgd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (lgd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Horizon Bancorp, Inc., Horizon Bank, filed by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leato et al v. Horizon Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Bancorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?