Dombek v. Standard Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Donald Dombek
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv05031
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 29, 2019. (jas)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Donald Dombek. (Lacy, Brandon)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/29/2019. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 20, 2019. (jas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Pautler, Richard)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Standard Insurance Company to State Court of Notice of Removal (Pautler, Richard)
February 14, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1868512.. (Pautler, Richard)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company. (Pautler, Richard)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Standard Insurance Company to Parties of Filing Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Pautler, Richard)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
February 14, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/19/2019 (lgd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in State Court with Jury Demand against Standard Insurance Company, filed by Donald Dombek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint, summons, proof of service)(lgd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for removal case initiated by Standard Insurance Company. (lgd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Washington County, case number 72CV-19-118., filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Complaint, Summons, Proof of Service, Insurance Documents)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dombek v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dombek
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Brandon B. Cate
Represented By: Richard J. Pautler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?