Smith v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance and Investment et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa Carol Lynn Smith
Defendant: McHughes Law Firm, LLC and Nationwide Mutual Insurance and Investment
Case Number: 5:2019cv05034
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER Dismissing Case With Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 15, 2019. (lgd)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 & #6 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on March 12, 2019. (tg)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vanessa Carol Lynn Smith. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 7, 2019. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(ee)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Vanessa Carol Lynn Smith. (src)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked RTS Attempted Not Known. Mail originally sent to Vanessa Smith at Leverett Ave., Fayetteville, AR including #4 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed and blank IFP. No new address available. (tg)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed AO 239 be filed. Completed AO 239 due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 19, 2019. (tg)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Vanessa Carol Lynn Smith. (src)
February 15, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(src)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Vanessa Carol Lynn Smith. (src)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against McHughes Law Firm, LLC, Nationwide Mutual Insurance and Investment, filed by Vanessa Carol Lynn Smith.(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance and Investment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHughes Law Firm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance and Investment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Carol Lynn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?