United States of America, et al vs. AEGIS Security Insurance Co., a foreign insurance company
Plaintiff: United States of America and United States of America for use and benefit of Fixtures & Drywall Company of Oklahoma, Inc. doing business as FADCO, Inc., an Oklahoma Corporation
Defendant: AEGIS Security Insurance Co., a foreign insurance company
Case Number: 5:2019cv05039
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to AEGIS Security Insurance Co., a foreign insurance company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to AEGIS Security Insurance Co. for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Hall, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1873358.. (Hall, Michael)
February 21, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/25/2019 (tg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by United States of America, et al. (tg) Modified on 2/21/2019 to edit name(tg).
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEGIS Security Insurance Co., filed by United States of America, et al. (tg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2019: #1 Exhibit A) (tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, et al vs. AEGIS Security Insurance Co., a foreign insurance company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEGIS Security Insurance Co., a foreign insurance company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Scott Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for use and benefit of Fixtures & Drywall Company of Oklahoma, Inc. doing business as FADCO, Inc., an Oklahoma Corporation
Represented By: Michael Scott Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?