Smith v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Plaintiff: Shellie Smith
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 5:2019cv05045
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann at the direction of chambers. (tg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines. No reply briefs will be allowed without leave of court. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 29, 2019. (slc)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Mathisen, Eric)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. The answer is due on 4/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 27, 2019. (ee)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Mathisen, Eric)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Mathisen, Eric)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Mathisen on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Mathisen, Eric)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Shellie Smith. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Returned Receipt)(Odom, Conrad)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Shellie Smith. (tg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 5006967), filed by Shellie Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shellie Smith
Represented By: Conrad T. Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?