Carroll v. Nanomech, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Carroll
Defendant: Nanomech, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05055
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case: re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by Daniel Carroll (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE). (tg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Daniel Carroll Without Prejudice. (Parker, Stephen)
June 25, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE regarding Proof of Service directed to Plaintiff Daniel Carroll. The docket does not reflect that proof of service or a motion and order to extend the time to complete service has been filed. No answer or other responsive pleading has been filed by the Defendant. The Plaintiff is directed to file proof of timely service, or a statement as to when such proof will be filed, within five (5) days of the filing of this Notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). Proof of Service due by 7/1/2019. (src)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Nanomech, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Nanomech, Inc. for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Parker, Stephen)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Daniel Carroll re #4 Order . (Parker, Stephen)
March 25, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1888228.. (Parker, Stephen)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to supplement jurisdictional allegations by filing a response to this order or an amended complaint by March 29, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 25, 2019. (src)
March 25, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/27/2019 (tg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Daniel Carroll. (tg)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nanomech, Inc., filed by Daniel Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Nanomech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Carroll
Represented By: Stephen C. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanomech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?