Archer et al v. Bond et al
Plaintiff: Jane Gochenour Archer and Julian Pratt Waterman Archer
Defendant: Bond Law Office, P.A., Stanley V. Bond and Stanley V. Bond, LTD
Case Number: 5:2019cv05075
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jane Gochenour Archer, Julian Pratt Waterman Archer. (Graham, William)
June 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2019. (lgd)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to file their Joint Rule 26(f) report is extended to June 28, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 24, 2019. (kce)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Report by Jane Gochenour Archer, Julian Pratt Waterman Archer. (Graham, William)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. WILLIAM W. GRAHAM appearing for Plaintiffs. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 15, 2019. (slc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney William W. Graham to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number BARWDC-1914986) by Jane Gochenour Archer, Julian Pratt Waterman Archer. (Graham, William)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/17/2019 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 10, 2019. (slc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Stanley V. Bond, Stanley V. Bond, LTD.(Bacon, Donald)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Howard Bacon on behalf of Stanley V. Bond, Stanley V. Bond, LTD. (Bacon, Donald)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Stanley V. Bond, LTD, Stanley V. Bond. Stanley V. Bond, LTD was sent waiver on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019; Stanley V. Bond was sent waiver on 4/17/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Bacon, Donald)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
April 16, 2019 Complaint filing fee submitted via Pay.gov: $ 400.00, receipt number AARWDC-1899581. (tg) Modified docket text on 4/16/2019 (mfr).
April 12, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Complaint #1 is not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:William W. Graham. An attorney can register for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (src)
April 12, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/15/2019 (src)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jane Gochenour Archer, Julian Pratt Waterman Archer. (src)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Stanley V. Bond, Bond Law Office, P.A., Stanley V. Bond, LTD, filed by Julian Pratt Waterman Archer, Jane Gochenour Archer.(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archer et al v. Bond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bond Law Office, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley V. Bond
Represented By: Donald Howard Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley V. Bond, LTD
Represented By: Donald Howard Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Gochenour Archer
Represented By: Franklin T Spencer
Represented By: William W Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Pratt Waterman Archer
Represented By: Franklin T Spencer
Represented By: William W Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?