Coulter v. Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC
Plaintiff: Jennifer Coulter
Defendant: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv05077
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooke M. Nixon on behalf of Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC. (Nixon, Brooke)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Scroggins on behalf of Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC. (Scroggins, Thomas)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jennifer Coulter. (Pawlik, Kristin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. THOMAS W. SCROGGINS is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter; AND GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. BROOKE M. NIXON is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 21, 2019. (slc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Brooke M. Nixon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1918127) by Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC. (Dougherty, Kirkman)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Thomas W. Scroggins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1918119) by Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC. (Dougherty, Kirkman)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC. (Dougherty, Kirkman)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/18/2019 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 22, 2019. (slc)
April 17, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1901329.. (Dougherty, Kirkman)
April 17, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/19/2019 (tg)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER filed in State Court to #3 Complaint by Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC.(tg)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in State Court with Jury Demand against Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC, filed by Jennifer Coulter.(tg)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC. (tg)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, Arkansas, case number 72CV-19-513., filed by Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint and state summons, #2 Answer)(tg) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (lgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coulter v. Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Coulter
Represented By: Kristin L. Pawlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northport Health Services of Arkansas, LLC
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: Thomas W. Scroggins
Represented By: Brooke M. Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?