Manley v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Manley
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, John Doe Entities 1 through 10 and UMR, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05078
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction [Surreply] filed by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph)
June 24, 2019 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion #28 for Leave to File A Surreply. Plaintiff is directed to file her surreply with the Court immediately. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 24, 2019. (cds)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by Deborah Manley. (Bates, Joseph)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Stockard, Wesley)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion #24 for Leave to File a Reply. Plaintiff is directed to immediately file her reply with the Court. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 20, 2019. (cds)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion to Remand by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting Joint Motion #22 for Extension of Time to File Replies. The parties are granted leave to file replies and both replies will be due on June 20, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 12, 2019. (cds)
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response to Motion in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Propoposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Seek Leave to File a Reply Brief)(Stockard, Wesley)
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand filed by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - John Harkness Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Subrogation claim samples, #3 Exhibit B - Check and letter Beneficiary G, #4 Exhibit C - Check and letter Beneficary R, #5 Exhibit D - Check and letter Beneficary W, #6 Exhibit E - Plan excerpts)(Lipschultz, Noah)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Deborah Manley. (Bates, Joseph)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to #14 Motion to Dismiss is due by June 5, 2019. Defendants' response to #16 Motion to Remand due by June 7, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 28, 2019. (src)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION For Extension of Time by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Stockard, Wesley)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #16 MOTION to Remand by Deborah Manley. (Bates, Joseph)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Deborah Manley. (Bates, Joseph)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Release, #2 Exhibit B - Steuck Declaration)(Madison, Eva)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 ***DISREGARD - INCORRECT DOCUMENT TITLE*** MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Madison, Eva) Modified at attorney's request on 5/15/2019 (lgd).
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley E Stockard on behalf of UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Stockard, Wesley)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Wesley E. Stockard is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 9, 2019.(cds)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Wesley E. Stockard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1912419) by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah G. Lipschultz on behalf of UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Lipschultz, Noah)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Noah Lipschultz is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 24, 2019. (jas)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Noah Lipschultz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1904632) by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer or other response to the #3 complaint must be filed by May 15, 2019. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 23, 2019. (rab)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, (or Otherwise Respond) by UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
April 18, 2019 Notice of Removal fee submitted via Pay.gov $ 400, receipt number AARWDC 1901219. (tg)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
April 17, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/19/2019 (lgd)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand and Exhibit A, Affidavit of Bill Horton, against John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, John Doe Entities 1 through 10, UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc., filed by Deborah Manley. (Attachments: #1 state summons issued)(lgd) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (lgd).
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, John Doe Entities 1 through 10, UMR, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas, UnitedHealth Group Inc., UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. (lgd) Modified to add defendant on 4/18/2019 (lgd).
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-19-578., filed by UnitedHealth Group Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., John Doe Corporations 1 through 10, UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co., UnitedHealthCare, Inc., John Doe Entities 1 through 10, UMR, Inc., United Healthcare of Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 State civcov sheet and complaint, #2 state summons issued)(lgd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2019 at request of filer: #3 Exhibit State Exhibit B) and additional defendant added (lgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manley v. UnitedHealth Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc.
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Wesley E Stockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Wesley E Stockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare, Inc.
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Wesley E Stockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare of Arkansas
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Wesley E Stockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare Insurance Co.
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Wesley E Stockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1 through 10
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entities 1 through 10
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: Noah G. Lipschultz
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Wesley E Stockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Manley
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Bill D. Reynolds
Represented By: William Gene Horton
Represented By: Tiffany Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Randall K. Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?